HI HB1321 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1321
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist Honolulu Seawater Air Conditioning, LLC, with the development of a seawater air-conditioning system in downtown Honolulu until June 30, 2024. (HB1321 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Seawater Air Conditioning Projects On Oahu.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 226) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:40AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP/EDB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1321 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
SB1002 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 046, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
SB1002 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 046, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).