HI HB1325 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 163, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 163, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to establish and report to the Legislature on parameters and construction requirements for biosecurity facilities that provide for and ensure the safety of agricultural and food commodities. Makes appropriations for the biosecurity program, including projects for import replacements of high risk crops. (HB1325 CD1)
Title
Relating To Biosecurity.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 163, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 163, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 173). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 173) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Takumi, Yamashita, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 4:05PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Takumi, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584). |
2017-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 536) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1348) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 184). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 548) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-03-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |