HI HB1326 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows for ten consecutive one-year holdovers of water permits under section 171-58(c), HRS. Makes conforming amendments to the reporting requirement in Act 126 (2016). Extends the repeal and reenactment provision for Act 126 (2016) by seven years, from June 30, 2019 to June 30, 2026. (HB1326 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Water Rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-19 4:00PM in conference room 211.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-19 10:45AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-12SenateRe-Referred to WTL/WAM.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 463).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Lowen, Matsumoto, San Buenaventura, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Eli, Gates, Kitagawa, D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (9) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Matayoshi, Nakamura excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1252) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Hashimoto, Holt, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Kitagawa, Wildberger; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, McDermott.
2019-02-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-02-20HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-15HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kitagawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, McKelvey, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1116 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WTL, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback