HI HB1330 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:15pm in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:15pm in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restores funds cut from the DOCARE budget over the past four years. Appropriates funds. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:15pm in Conference Room 224. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:35PM in Conference Room 224. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Solomon, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Evans, Lowen Co-Chairs; Coffman, Cheape. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 579) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1276) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1021) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ruderman. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 356). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 777) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |