HI HB1338 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1338
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism the China-Hawaii Economic Council to further economic relations between China and Hawaii. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-01-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1338 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB538 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4
HB538 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1338&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1338_.HTM |