HI HB1370 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 263, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1372).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 263, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1372).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires ERS to make direct payments to a spouse of a system member or retirant pursuant to a Hawaii domestic relations order. (HB1370 CD1)
Title
Employees' Retirement System Benefits; Domestic Relations Order ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 263, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1372). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 263, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1372). |
2016-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-3-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 166-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 166-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi, K.Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Keohokalole, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-16 9:35AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684). |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Matsumoto replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Pouha. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 514) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Kidani, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3584) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-31-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 313). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Choy, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, McDermott, Tupola voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 113) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Aquino, Ichiyama. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1324 (Same As)