HI HB1377 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1377
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes establishment of the Hawaii Airports Corporation within the Department of Transportation for administrative purposes. Sets out appointment of members to the board of directors and powers and duties of the Hawaii Airports Corporation. Transfers aeronautics functions of the Department of Transportation to the Hawaii Airports Corporation by the established transfer completion date agreed upon by the Hawaii Airports Corporation, the Director of Transportation, and the Governor, which shall be no later than 12/31/2022. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To An Airports Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1377 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1377&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1377_.HTM |