HI HB1388 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 128, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Act 128, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Sunrise Capital, Inc. in protecting its shrimp hatchery facility and its salt water well and relocating them further inland to avoid shoreline erosion. Effective 7/1/13. (SD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Processing Enterprises; Shrimp Hatchery Facility ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Act 128, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228). |
2013-06-18 | House | Act 128, on 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-13 at 3:30PM in Conference Room 224. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 4:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Ige, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Wooley, Onishi Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Cheape. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 582) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1251) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 361). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:15AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |