HI HB1394 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1394
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes any county with a population equal to or less than 500,000 that adopts a county surcharge on state tax ordinance to use the surcharges received from the State for infrastructure and public safety. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The County Surcharge On State Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719). |
2019-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 684) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Moriwaki, L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1771) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 482). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Lowen, Onishi, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1164) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1428 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1394 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).
HB1394 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).