HI HB1396 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 275, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1381).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the planning and design of the Nisei Veterans Legacy Center, subject to matching funds. Requires a report to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2014. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB1396 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Japanese American Experience in Hawaii; Nisei Veterans Legacy Center; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 275, 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1381).
2013-07-09HouseAct 275, on 7/9/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1381).
2013-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige.
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 116).
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 116) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Solomon, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Choy, Cullen, Ito, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 11:00AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-13 11:00AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710).
2013-04-18SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Wakai, Chair; Solomon, Chun Oakland, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Takai, Choy, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ito, Ward.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 584) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1385) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2013-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:20AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-03-22SenateReported from TEC/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1041) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman.
2013-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
2013-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on TEC/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2013-03-05SenateReferred to TEC/WTL, WAM.
2013-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 135).
2013-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 668), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2013-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
2013-02-15HouseReported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 457), recommending referral to FIN.
2013-02-12HouseThe committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Ohno, Takumi, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Takai.
2013-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-12-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2013-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
2013-02-08HouseReported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 208) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
2013-02-06HouseThe committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, McDermott.
2013-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-06-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2013-01-28HouseReferred to VMI, HED, FIN, referral sheet 7
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback