HI HB1404 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adjusts the operating budget for the fiscal biennium 2019-2021 operating budget of the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism programs under the purview of the House of Representatives Standing Committee on Water, Land, and Hawaiian Affairs. (HB1404 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism Budget.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2019-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on EET added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 483).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1288) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 793) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback