HI HB1405 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 260, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Public Utilities Commission to include a summary of the power purchase agreements in effect during the fiscal year in its annual report to the Governor. Clarifies the use of the public benefits fee under section 269-121, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to support clean energy technology, demand response technology, and energy use reduction, and demand-side management infrastructure. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB1405 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Energy; Public Utilities Commission; Public Benefits Fee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 260, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1363).
2013-07-09HouseAct 260, on 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1363).
2013-05-06HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 17).
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 17) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-22HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Kawakami, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2013-04-22SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 225.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: C. Lee, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Lowen, Thielen.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 585) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05SenateDeferred until 04-09-13.
2013-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-13.
2013-04-03SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1258) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom.
2013-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2013-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2013-03-22SenateReported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1029) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2013-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2013-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 3:20PM in conference room 225.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to ENE, CPN.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 363).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 847) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-27HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Evans, Har.
2013-02-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-02-25HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13.
2013-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-25-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
2013-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
2013-02-15HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 462) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2013-02-12HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2013-01-28HouseReferred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 7
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB64 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback