HI HB141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB141
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Telehealth Advisory Council within the DOH to advise the governor in the development and implementation of a comprehensive telehealth plan. Creates a permanent full-time Telehealth Coordinator to facilitate the establishment of infrastructure and policies across State and private entities and appropriates funds. Establishes a task force to reduce barriers in health care system credentialing, privileging, and other administrative processes. Act is repealed January 1, 2022. (HB141 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2019-02-11 | House | Recommitted to HLT as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Nakamura excused. |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HLT for further consideration. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Say. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-19 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB141 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19