HI HB1412 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 243, on 6/28/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 243, on 6/28/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to accommodate mooring of native Hawaiian canoes owned or leased by nonprofit entities and used for educational purposes in small boat harbors. (SD2)
Title
Small Boat Harbors; Native Hawaiian Canoes
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Act 243, on 6/28/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 243, 6/28/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1346). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-19 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Evans, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Solomon, Chair; Galuteria, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Dela Cruz, Kahele, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Hanohano, Evans Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Fale. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 586) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1339) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from WTL/THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 945) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Hee, Slom. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL/THA, WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 21). |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Friday, 02-08-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-31 | House | Re-referred to OMH/WAL, referral sheet 10 |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to OMH, WAL, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |