HI HB1414 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Labor Relations Board to determine qualifications for grievance arbitrators and interest arbitrators, and to review and determine qualifications and criteria for potential arbitrators to resolve collective bargaining impasses. (HB1414 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Labor Relations Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 108) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1414 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
SB1498 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 231, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
SB1498 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 231, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).