HI HB1417 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 082, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Human Services to use an integrated and multigenerational approach to delivering human services to reduce the incidence of intergenerational poverty and dependence on public benefits. (HB1417 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Human Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 082, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
2019-06-12HouseAct 082, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 22).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 22) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
2019-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Gates, Ward.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 859) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2012) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-03-14SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2019-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 485).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1208) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 671), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-12HouseBill re-scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback