HI HB1432 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1432
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Re-Referred to GVO/TEC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Re-Referred to GVO/TEC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the fiscal biennium 2019-2021 operating budget of certain programs of the Department of Accounting and General Services programs under the purview of the House of Representatives Standing Committee on Legislative Management. (HB1432 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Budget Of The Department Of Accounting And General Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/TEC, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TEC/GVO, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 303). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 536) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1432 (Carry Over) 2019-03-08 - Re-Referred to GVO/TEC, WAM.