HI HB144 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 174, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 174, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals chapter 373K, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Clarifies professional employer organization responsibilities with respect to meeting the statutory requirements of the repealed chapter 373K, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and the nexus between the registration of professional employer organizations and qualification for the state general excise tax exemption. Requires professional employer organizations to obtain a bond or irrevocable letter of credit equivalent on a sliding scale that is based on total payroll amount. Appropriates $13,000. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB144 CD1)
Title
Professional Employer Organizations; Registration; Fees; Bond ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 174, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 174, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott, Rhoads voting no (3) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 176). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 176) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, McKelvey, Hashem, Yamane, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-13 3:35PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, McKelvey, Hashem Co-Chairs; Yamane, Johanson. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 477) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1338) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 181). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 823), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 559) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Yamane. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 80) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-01-29 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB813 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.