HI HB144 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs and appropriates funds for UHERO to conduct an economic impact study regarding the impact of potential changes to coffee labeling laws on the local coffee industry. Establishes and appropriates funds for a coffee labeling task force. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Coffee Labeling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 03-20-19 1:16PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-13SenateRe-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:30PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to AEN, CPH.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 340).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Hashimoto, Holt, Kong, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Onishi, San Buenaventura, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1193) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong, Onishi; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 417), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-01-30HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Cachola, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-30-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB888 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN, CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback