HI HB1451 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1451
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Re-Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Re-Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the Ohana Zones Pilot Program to June 30, 2022 and the Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program and the Medical Respite Pilot Program to June 30, 2020. (HB1451 HD3)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HOU/CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 488). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1244) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 48) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Friday, 02-01-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1451 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Re-Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM.
Subjects
Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program
Homelessness
Medical Respite Pilot Program
Ohana Zones Pilot Program
Homelessness
Medical Respite Pilot Program
Ohana Zones Pilot Program