HI HB1468 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1468
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Department of Health to provide the Waianae Coast Comprehensive Health Center with funding for an advanced practice registered nurse position and various infrastructure improvements for its school-based health center at Nanakuli High and Intermediate School. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Waianae Coast Comprehensive Health Center.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Cullen Co-Chairs; Eli, Ward. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 864) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1932) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1398) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 493). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1200) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 372) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1468 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
SB1437 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
SB1437 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH, WAM.