HI HB1485 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-19 11:00AM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a process, beginning on January 1, 2020, for automatically preregistering or registering public school- and charter school-enrolled students who are at least 16 years old to vote. Effective 7/1/2030. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voter Registration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-19 11:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Changed: Representative Cullen added as Co-Chair. Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 865) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReported from EDU/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1878) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 3:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to EDU/JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 495).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1206) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-01-31HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 2:01PM in conference room 325.
2019-01-31HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-31HouseRe-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback