HI HB1486 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an applicant to successfully complete a firearms safety or training course within thirty days before applying for or renewing a license to carry a concealed or unconcealed weapon. Repeals the ban on electric guns.
Title
Relating To Guns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1486 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1486&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1486_.HTM |