HI HB1488 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1488
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to GVO/LCA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to GVO/LCA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DAGS, in consultation with the Legislature and appropriate agencies, to develop and implement an enhanced security plan for the State Capitol. Appropriates funds to DAGS for enhanced security measures and security improvements, including vehicular barriers and to PSD to purchase or lease security screening equipment and contract private screening personnel for the State Capitol. (HB1488 HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO/LCA/PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 126). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 910), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LMG/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Belatti, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG/JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LMG/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1488 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to GVO/LCA/PSM, WAM.