HI HB1504 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1504
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes void the existing administrative rules of the industrial hemp pilot program.
Title
Relating To Industrial Hemp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:15AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1504 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1504&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1504_.HTM |