HI HB1509 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1509
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Progressively bans the sale of cigarettes by raising the minimum age of persons to whom cigarettes may be legally sold to 30 years of age in 2020, 40 years of age in 2021, 50 years of age in 2022, 60 years of age in 2023, and then 100 years of age in 2024.
Title
Relating To Cigarettes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1509 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1509&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1509_.HTM |