HI HB153 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB153
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the public health and pharmacy formulary advisory committee to advise the Board of Pharmacy in developing a formulary of drugs and devices that a pharmacist may prescribe and dispense. Authorizes the Board of Pharmacy to allow pharmacists to prescribe vaccines as well as drugs and devices from the formulary developed with the assistance of the advisory committee.
Title
Relating To The Practice Of Pharmacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB153 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=153&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB153_.HTM |