HI HB1532 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the reserved housing requirement for a major development on a lot of at least 1 acre in the Kakaako community development district, mauka area.
Title
Kakaako Community Development District, Mauka Area; Reserved Housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-09 9:00am in conference room 325. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-18-09. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/HSG on Wednesday, 02-11-09 9:00 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to WLO/HSG, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1532&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1532_.HTM |