HI HB1532 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 106, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 106, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires real property tax appellants to first obtain a decision from an administrative body established by county ordinance, prior to appealing to the tax appeal court, if required to do so by county ordinance. (SD2)
Title
Real Property Tax Appeals; Tax Appeal Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | (S) Act 106, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209). | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Act 106, on 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 699). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 695). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) B. Oshiro, Choy, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 1:45PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 1:45PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: B. Oshiro, Choy Co-Chairs; Luke, Thielen. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 590) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1259) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-06-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 888) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-11 3:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 338). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 919) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-11 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 397) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Ito, McKelvey. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-10-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |