HI HB1532 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti, McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti, McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Ethics Commission to review the University of Hawaii Board of Regents' official disclosures to determine if any decision or action by a Board of Regents member violated conflict-of-interest laws. Protects from public disclosure the financial disclosure statements of the University of Hawaii Board of Regents that are filed with the State Ethics Commission. (HB1532 HD1)
Title
UH; Board of Regents; Ethics Code; Financial Disclosures
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti, McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 215-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Kong, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ohno, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-02-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to HED, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2080 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Referred to HEA, JDL.