HI HB1533 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes a non-binding referendum to permit gambling in the State, in accordance with law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Non-binding Referendum; Permit Gambling

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-12-01 Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
2011-02-08 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
2011-02-03 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-08-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312.
2011-01-28 (H) Referred to ERB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2011-01-26 (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback