HI HB1533 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a historic preservation income tax credit. Appropriates funds for one temporary position to assist with the establishment and administration of the historic preservation income tax credit program. Effective on 1/1/2020. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Historic Preservation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Brower, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 872) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2018) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1344) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 129).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 852), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Cullen, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Hashimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-12-19 10:15AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback