HI HB1534 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that workers registered with the department of health's medical cannabis program be reimbursed for the out of pocket cost of medical cannabis through the workers' compensation system in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1534 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1523 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
SB1523 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1534&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1534_.HTM |