HI HB1543 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1543
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a process allowing law enforcement officers and family or household members to obtain a court order to prevent a person from accessing firearms and ammunition where the person poses a danger of causing bodily injury to oneself or another.
Title
Relating To Gun Violence Protective Orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1543 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1543&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1543_.HTM |