HI HB1547 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 264, 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1366).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii for athletics. (HB1547 CD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making An Appropriation To The University Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 264, 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1366).
2019-07-09HouseAct 264, on 07/08/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1366).
2019-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 888).
2019-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 970).
2019-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-04-30Senate48 Hrs. Notice 05-02-19.
2019-04-30SenateReport filed.
2019-04-30SenateSeparated Committee Report.
2019-04-30SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2).
2019-04-30SenateFloor Amendment No. 27 offered.
2019-04-30HouseFloor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused.
2019-04-30HouseFloor Amendment No. 11 offered by Rep. Belatti.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 199).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 199) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Todd, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-19 11:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 958).
2019-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 955).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Discharged.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 2:05PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Todd Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Okimoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 805).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 891) in amended form (SD 3).
2019-04-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-19.
2019-04-09SenateReport filed.
2019-04-09SenateSeparated Committee Report.
2019-04-09SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
2019-04-09SenateFloor Amendment No. 13 offered.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2031) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1452) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 03-19-19 3:05PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to HRE, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 500).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1218) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 432) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1547&year=2019
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_HD1_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_HD2_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_SD1_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_SD2_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_SD2_SFA13_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_SD3_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_CD1_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_CD1_HFA11_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_CD1_SFA27_.HTM
Texthttps://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1547_CD2_.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback