HI HB1552 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 179, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1281).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Part I: Establishes the Hawaii Correctional System Oversight Commission. Creates a position for an Oversight Coordinator for the Commission. Extends the sunset date of the Reentry Commission to 1/1/2020. Repeals the Reentry Commission and Corrections Population Management Commission on 1/1/2020 and transfers all rights, powers, functions, and duties of those commissions to the Hawaii Correctional System Oversight Commission. Parts II through IX: Implements certain recommendations of the Criminal Pretrial Task Force convened pursuant to House Concurrent Resolution No. 134, House Draft 1, Regular Session of 2017. (HB1552 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-05SenateAct 179, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1281).
2019-07-05HouseAct 179, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1281).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Say, Ward voting no (3) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 149).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 149) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, L. Thielen, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, C. Lee, Gates, Kong, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 016.
2019-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; L. Thielen, Riviere, K. Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takayama, C. Lee, Gates Co-Chairs; Kong, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 877) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2062) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-19 10:45AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from PSM/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:10PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-08SenateRe-Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to PSM, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 322).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1128), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 743) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2019-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1424 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback