HI HB1558 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 146, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 146, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Planning to update the Hawaii 2050 Sustainability Plan and submit the updated plan to the Legislature prior to the Regular Session of 2021 and every tenth session thereafter, using the goals and priority guidelines of the Hawaii State Planning Act and the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Initiative as guiding principles. Appropriates funds. (HB1558 CD1)
Title
Relating To Sustainability.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Act 146, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248). |
2019-07-01 | House | Act 146, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1248). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 94). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 94) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, K. Kahele, Riviere, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 11:30AM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; K. Kahele, Riviere, S. Chang Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Yamane, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Har, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 878) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2065) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Taniguchi. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM/HOU. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1490) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 324). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 978), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:55AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |