HI HB1568 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1568
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program at UH to offer assistance and support to students of Pacific Islander ancestry in obtaining their general educational development diplomas, completing vocational training at a UH community college, and obtaining employment. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 02-08-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1568 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1568&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1568_.HTM |