HI HB1572 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1572
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority. Transfers jurisdiction and functions relating to commercial harbors and commercial maritime operations from the Department of Transportation to the Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Commercial Harbors Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 11:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1572 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1572&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1572_.HTM |