HI HB1576 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1576
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a retailer of certain batteries to implement a program in which the retailer accepts used batteries for reuse, recycling, or other means of disposal. Requires the Department of Health to expand its recycling operations to accommodate the recycling of batteries. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Solid Waste.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1576 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1576&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1576_.HTM |