HI HB158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies requirements for contractor or subcontractor payment to all mechanics and laborers employed on a government service contract job site. Permits governmental contracting agencies to withhold accrued payments as necessary to pay mechanics and laborers. Requires that contractors for public works projects maintain and submit weekly certified payroll records to demonstrate compliance with wage and hour requirements. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Labor Law Compliance For Government Contracts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Eli Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
2019-04-09HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 664) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1765) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from GVO/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1462) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 3:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to GVO/LCA, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 341).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1241), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
2019-02-04HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 17) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-01-29HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback