HI HB1582 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum length of concession contracts from 15 years to 20 years. Replaces requirements that certain concessions shall be operated by nonprofit corporations in order to be exempt from the sealed bid requirements of section 102-2(a), Hawaii Revised Statutes, with a requirement that state and county agencies give preference to nonprofit corporations pursuant to rules. Provides that a county director of parks and recreation shall designate which county zoos, botanic gardens, or other county parks are environmentally, culturally, historically, or operationally unique for the purpose of determining whether a concession at the zoo, botanic garden, or other park is exempt from the sealed bid requirements of section 102-2(a), Hawaii Revised Statutes. Exempts from sealed bid requirements of section 102-2(a), Hawaii Revised Statutes, concessions on public property whose operations provide historical and cultural information, goods, and services within the Hawaii Capital Historic District. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Concessions On Public Property.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; English Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 805). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 892) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-19. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report filed. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 17 offered. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2022) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1507) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/LCA, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 328). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1001), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 697) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-02-11 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1582 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).