HI HB159 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases criminal penalties for anyone who knowingly keeps or maintains any structure or place for the purpose of using controlled substances or which is used for keeping or selling them in violation of controlled substance laws. Increases certain criminal penalties for those who knowingly profit from or advance gambling. Effective 1/28/2081. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Crime.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 699) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1941) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-03-22SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1370) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:35PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 342).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
2019-02-07HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-07HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback