HI HB159 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases criminal penalties for anyone who knowingly keeps or maintains any structure or place for the purpose of using controlled substances or which is used for keeping or selling them in violation of controlled substance laws. Increases certain criminal penalties for those who knowingly profit from or advance gambling. Effective 1/28/2081. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Crime.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 699) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1941) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1370) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 342). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB159 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).