HI HB1609 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes business practice and transparency reporting requirements for pharmacy benefit managers. Replaces the registration requirement for pharmacy benefit managers with a licensing requirement. Increases penalties for violations of the pharmacy benefit managers law. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 507-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 55-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2020-01-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-28-20 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2226 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.