HI HB1616 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Act 155, 6/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adds to the Hawaii State Planning Act's objectives and policies for health, the identification of social determinants of health and prioritization of programs, services, interventions, and activities that address identified social determinants of health to improve Native Hawaiian health in accordance with federal law and reduce health disparities of disproportionately affected demographics. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OHA Package; State Planning Act; Health Disparities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-03SenateAct 155, 6/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
2014-07-03HouseAct 155, on 6/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
2014-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2014-05-01SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration; agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 752).
2014-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito, C. Lee excused (2).
2014-05-01SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 748).
2014-04-29HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2014-04-29HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-01-14.
2014-04-14HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675).
2014-04-14SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Green Co-Chair; Galuteria, Nishihara, Slom Members.
2014-04-02SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 408).
2014-04-01HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2014-03-31HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 419) in amended form (SD 1).
2014-03-31SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
2014-03-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-31-14.
2014-03-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2014-03-28SenateReported from HWN/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3143) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2014-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
2014-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom.
2014-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-14 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to HWN/HTH.
2014-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 228).
2014-03-04HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakashima excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2014-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
2014-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2014-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
2014-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308.
2014-02-14HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
2014-02-14HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420-14), recommending referral to FIN.
2014-02-11HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
2014-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-11-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2014-02-05HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1).
2014-02-05HouseReported from OMH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 166-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
2014-02-03HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro.
2014-02-03HouseThe committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale.
2014-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by OMH/HLT on Monday, 02-03-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2014-01-23HouseRe-referred to OMH/HLT, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4
2014-01-17HouseReferred to HLT, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 2
2014-01-15HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2014-01-10HousePrefiled

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback