HI HB1621 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1252).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Part I: Prohibits a merchant from charging a purchaser any fee, including a processing fee or an administrative fee, to repair, replace, or refund damaged or defective goods. Part II: Requires high turnover restaurant franchisees to disclose their non-participation in national advertising campaigns of the franchise in which discounts or promotions are offered. Prohibits the high turnover restaurant franchisor from limiting or restricting the disclosures. Part II sunsets on 7/1/2023. (HB1621 CD1)
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1252). |
2018-07-10 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1252). |
2018-06-25 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-18 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 707). |
2018-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | House | Postponed to 05-03-18 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 42-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 42-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 11:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi Chair; Ichiyama, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 594) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3428) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3). |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-18. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2057 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to CPH.
Subjects
Advertising Campaigns
Franchisees
Franchisors
High Turnover Restaurants
Merchandise
Non-participation
Refund
Repair
Replacement
Returns
Unfair or Deceptive Trade Acts or Practices
Franchisees
Franchisors
High Turnover Restaurants
Merchandise
Non-participation
Refund
Repair
Replacement
Returns
Unfair or Deceptive Trade Acts or Practices