HI HB1635 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a planned community association from prohibiting a member from constructing an accessory dwelling unit that is under the separate ownership or occupancy of the member. Takes effect on 7/1/2025. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Planned Community Associations.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 81-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled. |