HI HB164 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the definition of "business day" to the offense of abuse of a family or household member. Repeals the forty-eight hour no contact provision and specifies that the period of separation that a police officer shall order the person who the police officer reasonably believes to have inflicted the abuse of a family or household member commences when the order is issued and expires at 6:00 p.m. on the second business day following the day the order was issued.
Title
Abuse of a Family or Household Member; No Contact Order
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB226 (Same As) 2015-07-10 - Act 221, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=164&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB164_.HTM |