HI HB164 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 5:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all persons and committees that make electioneering communication expenditures to a single vendor of more than $2,000 in aggregate within one week to file a report with the Campaign Spending Commission within thirty days of a primary election or sixty days of a general or special election. Amends the definition of "disclosure date" to mean the date when the electioneering communication is publicly distributed. Expands the definition of "electioneering communication" in section 11341(d), HRS, to apply to advertisements: (1) sent by any mail rate; and (2) that are expenditures of an organization. Repeals section 11341(e), HRS. Requires any advertisement by a noncandidate committee that makes only independent expenditures to disclose its top three contributors. Effective 3/15/2094. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electioneering Communications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 5:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-18HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-19 3:03PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-17HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-18-19 3:41PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-16HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-17-19 4:35PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Wakai, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 700) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1888) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 344).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB139 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback